NY S09420 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to parametric insurance; requires insurers providing parametric insurance include certain disclosures in the application for the policy; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to parametric insurance; requires insurers providing parametric insurance include certain disclosures in the application for the policy; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10344 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1261 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10344 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY