NY S09399 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - SIGNED CHAP.216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - SIGNED CHAP.216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a rebate against real property taxes for certain owners of one, two or three family residential real property or residential property held in the condominium or cooperative form of ownership for the fiscal year commencing on the first of July, two thousand twenty-one in the city of New York.
Title
Relates to a rebate against real property taxes for certain owners of one, two or three family residential real property or residential property held in the condominium or cooperative form of ownership for the fiscal year commencing on the first of July, two thousand twenty-one in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.216 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.586 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a10440 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1616 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A10440 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9399