NY S09316 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.350
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.350
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the Ardsley Volunteer Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.
Title
Exempts the Ardsley Volunteer Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.350 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.510 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a10418a |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1597 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9316A |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10418 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - substituted by s9316a