NY S09247 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Fulton city school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Permits the Fulton city school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.616 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a8335 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1594 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08335 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9247