NY S09136 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands authorization for certain exemptions from filing requirements.
Title
Expands authorization for certain exemptions from filing requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2024-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1259 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10298 (Same As) 2024-05-17 - referred to insurance