NY S09034 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - SIGNED CHAP.279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - SIGNED CHAP.279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the court, in its discretion, to conduct an electronic appearance in connection with a criminal action in Monroe county.
Title
Authorizes the court, in its discretion, to conduct an electronic appearance in connection with a criminal action in Monroe county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.279 |
2024-08-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.508 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a9931 |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2024-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1522 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09931 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s9034