NY S08987 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various provisions regarding establishment of a hospital: provides that any person and various other listed entities (i.e., partnership, company, stockholder, member, corporation or other entity) with authority to operate a hospital, shall be subject to approval for establishment by the public health council (unless otherwise authorized to operate a hospital without such establishment approval); provides that any assignment or delegation of any authority to operate a hospital shall be subject to approval for establishment by the council (with certain specified exceptions); specifies circumstances under which a person, partnership, company, etc. shall be deemed to have authority to operate a hospital subject to approval for establishment by the council (with certain specified exceptions); specifies circumstances under which a person, partnership, company, etc. shall be deemed to have authority to operate a hospital (i.e., if it has decision-making authority over listed matters).
Title
Makes various provisions regarding establishment of a hospital: provides that any person and various other listed entities (i.e., partnership, company, stockholder, member, corporation or other entity) with authority to operate a hospital, shall be subject to approval for establishment by the public health council (unless otherwise authorized to operate a hospital without such establishment approval); provides that any assignment or delegation of any authority to operate a hospital shall be subject to approval for establishment by the council (with certain specified exceptions); specifies circumstances under which a person, partnership, company, etc. shall be deemed to have authority to operate a hospital subject to approval for establishment by the council (with certain specified exceptions); specifies circumstances under which a person, partnership, company, etc. shall be deemed to have authority to operate a hospital (i.e., if it has decision-making authority over listed matters).
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8987A |
2024-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.999 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05375 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - amended on third reading 5375a