NY S08977 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement officers to conduct a lethality assessment as part of the standardized domestic incident report form when responding to incidents of domestic violence.
Title
Requires law enforcement officers to conduct a lethality assessment as part of the standardized domestic incident report form when responding to incidents of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.863 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09892 (Same As) 2024-04-26 - referred to governmental operations