NY S08919 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Passed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - SIGNED CHAP.675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Passed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - SIGNED CHAP.675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Protects certain agreements between public service companies and their employees.
Title
Protects certain agreements between public service companies and their employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-09 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.675 |
2022-12-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.580 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a10216a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1307 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10216 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8919