NY S08806 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9828
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9828
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the residency requirement for the comptroller and building inspector in the town of Chester, county of Orange.
Title
Waives the residency requirement for the comptroller and building inspector in the town of Chester, county of Orange.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9828 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.899 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09828 (Same As) 2024-08-28 - signed chap.251