NY S08759 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a sex offender whose victim was a child and level 3 sex offenders from knowingly being within 1,000 feet of a child care provider, preschool or any facility where pre-kindergarten or kindergarten instruction is provided.
Title
Prohibits a sex offender whose victim was a child and level 3 sex offenders from knowingly being within 1,000 feet of a child care provider, preschool or any facility where pre-kindergarten or kindergarten instruction is provided.
Sponsors
Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2124 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A10731 (Same As) 2018-05-16 - referred to correction