NY S08746 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9516
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9516
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions related to public arbitration panels until 2029.
Title
Extends provisions related to public arbitration panels until 2029.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9516 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1451 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09516 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - signed chap.134