NY S08711 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Roosevelt Fire District to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption.
Title
Permits the Roosevelt Fire District to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.151 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.947 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8711 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.178 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.178 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-08 | Senate | print number 8283a |
2020-07-08 | Senate | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8283A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.947 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-07-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08283 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.151