NY S08662 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain property in Erie county from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a school.
Title
Exempts certain property in Erie county from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | signed chap.181 |
2020-09-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.998 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8662 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.215 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.215 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-01 | Senate | referred to economic development |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10707 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.998 |
2020-07-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10707 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - signed chap.181