NY S08576 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on September 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Church of the Living God Pillar & Ground to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for the 2022-2023 assessment rolls.
Title
Authorizes the Church of the Living God Pillar & Ground to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for the 2022-2023 assessment rolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.624 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a9141 |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2024-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.471 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09141 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s8576