NY S08567 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs a city with a population of one million or more to reduce its real property tax levy for the 2019 fiscal year by an amount not less than the real property tax increase authorized pursuant to local law 40 of the city of New York for the year 2002.
Title
Directs a city with a population of one million or more to reduce its real property tax levy for the 2019 fiscal year by an amount not less than the real property tax increase authorized pursuant to local law 40 of the city of New York for the year 2002.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1444 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |