NY S08561 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8232A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8232A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for appointment to county boards of health and health services advisory boards to include nurse practitioners and physician assistants; expands to residents in the county or residents of a contiguous county who have a background in a health-related field and perform substantial work in the county associated with their health-related background.
Title
Expands eligibility for appointment to county boards of health and health services advisory boards to include nurse practitioners and physician assistants; expands to residents in the county or residents of a contiguous county who have a background in a health-related field and perform substantial work in the county associated with their health-related background.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8232A |
2024-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.564 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08232 (Same As) 2024-01-22 - REFERRED TO HEALTH