NY S08450 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8319C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8319C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds telephone numbers to a do-not-call list at the outset of certain telemarketing calls.
Title
Adds telephone numbers to a do-not-call list at the outset of certain telemarketing calls.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8319C |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1371 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8450B |
2022-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-04-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8450A |
2022-04-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08319 (Same As) 2022-12-06 - signed chap.660