NY S08409 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9423A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9423A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the signature requirement for petitions for candidates for the school board of the city of Buffalo.
Title
Reduces the signature requirement for petitions for candidates for the school board of the city of Buffalo.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9423A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1777 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8409A |
2022-03-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2022-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09423 (Same As) 2022-08-11 - signed chap.495