NY S08331 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Ithaca to establish hotel and motel taxes of up to five percent.
Title
Authorizes the city of Ithaca to establish hotel and motel taxes of up to five percent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.364 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.992 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8331 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Senate | home rule request |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.268 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | rules report cal.268 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-11 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10415 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.992 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10415 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - signed chap.364