NY S08229 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts Lulu and Leo's law establishing the crime of misrepresentation by, or on behalf of, a caregiver for children when a person knowingly makes a misrepresentation about a caregiver's background; class A misdemeanor.
Title
Enacts Lulu and Leo's law establishing the crime of misrepresentation by, or on behalf of, a caregiver for children when a person knowingly makes a misrepresentation about a caregiver's background; class A misdemeanor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 8229A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1009 |
2018-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |