NY S08214 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the board of trustees of the New York state higher education services corporation.
Title
Relates to the board of trustees of the New York state higher education services corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1116 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |