NY S08184 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - referred to people with disabilities
Pending: Assembly People with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - referred to people with disabilities
Pending: Assembly People with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to the care demonstration program from March 31, 2024 until March 31, 2026.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to the care demonstration program from March 31, 2024 until March 31, 2026.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
2024-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.408 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09061 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - referred to people with disabilities