NY S08171 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-25 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-25 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to establish a uniform letter grading system to classify the result of an inspection of a food service establishment; directs such commissioner and local health officers to require the display of any letter grade received pursuant to such system; requires reinspection of establishment receiving a grade of less than "A"; provisions do not apply to food establishments in cities having a population of one million or more.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to establish a uniform letter grading system to classify the result of an inspection of a food service establishment; directs such commissioner and local health officers to require the display of any letter grade received pursuant to such system; requires reinspection of establishment receiving a grade of less than "A"; provisions do not apply to food establishments in cities having a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | referred to health | |
2010-06-24 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-24 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-22 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1120 | |
2010-06-14 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A11528 (Same As) 2010-06-22 - referred to health