NY S08134 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a New York state public housing painters apprenticeship program for municipal housing authority residents.
Title
Establishes a New York state public housing painters apprenticeship program for municipal housing authority residents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8134A |
2024-05-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2024-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09272 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - print number 9272a