NY S08121 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8121A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8121A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the state of emergency minority and women owned business enterprises loan and grant program relating to the novel coronavirus (COVID-19).
Title
Establishes the state of emergency minority and women owned business enterprises loan and grant program relating to the novel coronavirus (COVID-19).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8121A |
2020-05-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-04-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A10551 (Same As) 2020-05-28 - referred to governmental operations