NY S08113 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A879
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A879
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of a clinical peer reviewer by clarifying that such term shall be applicable for the entire utilization review and external appeal article and means either a physician or a health care professional with certain qualifications.
Title
Relates to the definition of a clinical peer reviewer by clarifying that such term shall be applicable for the entire utilization review and external appeal article and means either a physician or a health care professional with certain qualifications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A879 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1658 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00879 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - tabled