NY S08049 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8486
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends time frame to two years to receive updated mandated reporter training to include guidance on identifying an abused or maltreated child when such child is an individual with an intellectual or developmental disability.
Title
Extends time frame to two years to receive updated mandated reporter training to include guidance on identifying an abused or maltreated child when such child is an individual with an intellectual or developmental disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8486 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.188 |
2024-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08486 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - signed chap.25