NY S08027 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Hempstead, county of Nassau, to accept from Mercy Medical Center an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Hempstead, county of Nassau, to accept from Mercy Medical Center an application for exemption from real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.727 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8027A |
2020-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09998 (Same As) 2020-07-17 - reported referred to ways and means