NY S07965 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.279
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.279
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to an exemption of capital improvements to multiple dwelling buildings within certain cities with a population of more than eight thousand but less than nine thousand.
Title
Relates to an exemption of capital improvements to multiple dwelling buildings within certain cities with a population of more than eight thousand but less than nine thousand.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.279 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.506 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10496b |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1834 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7965B |
2016-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2016-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7965A |
2016-06-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2016-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10496 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7965b