NY S07939 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Peconic Land Trust to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in the town of Brookhaven.
Title
Authorizes the Peconic Land Trust to file an application for exemption from real property taxes for a certain parcel of land located in the town of Brookhaven.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.230 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.252 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a10422 |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1665 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10422 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7939