NY S07937 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to make correctional facility water testing results accessible directly to incarcerated individuals and correctional facility staff in such facilities and make such water testing results available to the public on the website of the department.
Title
Requires the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to make correctional facility water testing results accessible directly to incarcerated individuals and correctional facility staff in such facilities and make such water testing results available to the public on the website of the department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.684 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09611 (Same As) 2024-03-26 - referred to correction