NY S07908 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the empire state development corporation to study a proposed rule of the department of labor relating to call-in pay prior to its adoption.
Title
Directs the empire state development corporation to study a proposed rule of the department of labor relating to call-in pay prior to its adoption.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1013 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7908A |
2018-04-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10423 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - held for consideration in labor