NY S07889 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8746
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8746
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Moves the section relating to the manufacture of seasonal and decorative lighting products containing lead from the public health law to the general business law.
Title
Moves the section relating to the manufacture of seasonal and decorative lighting products containing lead from the public health law to the general business law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8746 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.303 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08746 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - signed chap.40