NY S07868 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to claims for conviction, compensation for claimants who were wrongly incarcerated and the expungement of criminal records for unjustly convicted claimants.
Title
Relates to claims for conviction, compensation for claimants who were wrongly incarcerated and the expungement of criminal records for unjustly convicted claimants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-14 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-10 | 1ST REPORT CAL.956 | |
2010-06-02 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-05-18 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A11150 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - referred to judiciary