NY S07858 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - SIGNED CHAP.167
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - SIGNED CHAP.167
Summary
Relates to imposing civil penalties for violations of the rules of the Brooklyn bridge park development corporation; provides for the adjudication of such violations by the environmental control board, and clarifies the authority of the NYC department of parks and recreation.
Title
Relates to imposing civil penalties for violations of the rules of the Brooklyn bridge park development corporation; provides for the adjudication of such violations by the environmental control board, and clarifies the authority of the NYC department of parks and recreation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | SIGNED CHAP.167 | |
2010-06-25 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-23 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-23 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-23 | home rule request | |
2010-06-23 | ordered to third reading rules cal.307 | |
2010-06-23 | substituted for a11099a | |
2010-06-16 | referred to codes | |
2010-06-16 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-16 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2010-06-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-14 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-10 | 1ST REPORT CAL.955 | |
2010-06-08 | PRINT NUMBER 7858A | |
2010-06-08 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | |
2010-06-08 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-05-18 | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A11099 (Same As) 2010-06-23 - substituted by s7858a
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07858&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |