NY S07854 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the investigation of any claim of medical professional misconduct based solely on treatment that is not universally accepted by the medical profession.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the investigation of any claim of medical professional misconduct based solely on treatment that is not universally accepted by the medical profession.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-17AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.27
2014-12-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.532
2014-12-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading cal.646
2014-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a7558b
2014-06-18Assemblyreferred to health
2014-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1571
2014-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A07558 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7854

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback