NY S07851 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating a tax credit for companies that invest in certain dairy equipment and use such equipment to produce value added flavored or enhanced dairy products.
Title
Relates to creating a tax credit for companies that invest in certain dairy equipment and use such equipment to produce value added flavored or enhanced dairy products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1589 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10268 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - referred to ways and means