NY S07781 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Note: Replaces legislation S07781
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-13 - approval memo.31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-13 - approval memo.31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commission of corrections and community supervision to establish an annual heat mitigation plan; directs the extreme heat action plan work group of the department of environmental conservation to analyze the impact of extreme heat on incarcerated individuals and people working in prisons.
Title
Directs the commission of corrections and community supervision to establish an annual heat mitigation plan; directs the extreme heat action plan work group of the department of environmental conservation to analyze the impact of extreme heat on incarcerated individuals and people working in prisons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-13 | Assembly | approval memo.31 |
2024-12-13 | Assembly | signed chap.561 |
2024-12-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.369 |
2024-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7781A |
2024-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9169a |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.434 |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2024-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7781A |
2024-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.369 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-12-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |