NY S07766 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fiber-based services being provided to tenants; prevents landlords from: demanding or accepting payment from tenants in exchange for permitting fiber optic service on or within such landlord's property or premises; or discriminating in rental charges or otherwise, between tenants who receive fiber optic service and those who do not.
Title
Relates to fiber-based services being provided to tenants; prevents landlords from: demanding or accepting payment from tenants in exchange for permitting fiber optic service on or within such landlord's property or premises; or discriminating in rental charges or otherwise, between tenants who receive fiber optic service and those who do not.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.156 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.488 |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | substituted for a9285 |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-01-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.280 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09285 (Same As) 2022-03-15 - substituted by s7766