NY S07748 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the heroin and opioid addiction wraparound demonstration services program; makes provisions permanent.
Title
Relates to the heroin and opioid addiction wraparound demonstration services program; makes provisions permanent.
Sponsors
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2016-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.865 |
2016-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7748A |
2016-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A10119 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - reported referred to rules