NY S07730 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that component school districts cannot impose a tax levy for their share of the board of cooperative educational services capital expenditures.
Title
Provides that component school districts cannot impose a tax levy for their share of the board of cooperative educational services capital expenditures.
Sponsors
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.359 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.280 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9825 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1770 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09825 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7730