NY S07725 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "election workers and polling places protection act" to protect poll watchers, election officials, voters and physical property being used as a polling place or by the board of elections.
Title
Enacts the "election workers and polling places protection act" to protect poll watchers, election officials, voters and physical property being used as a polling place or by the board of elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2024-03-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7725A |
2024-03-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2023-10-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04759 (Same As) 2024-04-08 - print number 4759b