NY S07723 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 7723B
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 7723B
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the operation of unmanned aircraft, including drones, over school grounds or critical infrastructure; provides penalties for violations.
Title
Prohibits the operation of unmanned aircraft, including drones, over school grounds or critical infrastructure; provides penalties for violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7723B |
2024-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2024-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7723A |
2024-01-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-10-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08176 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - print number 8176b