NY S07697 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of children and family services to complete a report on the impact of a tax deduction for expenses, including adoption fees, medical and legal fees, court costs and any other related expenses paid or incurred by a taxpayer attributed to the adoption of a child in foster care.
Title
Requires the office of children and family services to complete a report on the impact of a tax deduction for expenses, including adoption fees, medical and legal fees, court costs and any other related expenses paid or incurred by a taxpayer attributed to the adoption of a child in foster care.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.496 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.792 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a8176b |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1653 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A08176 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7697