NY S07642 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to directing the commissioner to convene statewide and regional conventions to bring together underrepresented educators annually to discuss experiences, best practices, and afford for networking, mentorship opportunities, and support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to directing the commissioner to convene statewide and regional conventions to bring together underrepresented educators annually to discuss experiences, best practices, and afford for networking, mentorship opportunities, and support.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13Assemblyreferred to education
2020-02-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-02-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-02-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-02-11Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-02-10Senate1ST REPORT CAL.380
2020-02-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A09730 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback