NY S07628 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.472
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.472
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends deadline during which to file as having a World Trade Center condition, and modifies qualifications.
Title
Extends deadline during which to file as having a World Trade Center condition, and modifies qualifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.472 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.309 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9562a |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1308 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7628A |
2014-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09562 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s7628a