NY S07603 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8741C
Status: Introduced on April 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8741C
Summary
Relates to causes of action against certain businesses arising in connection with the AED; provides that gross negligence by a business or employee must be shown; provides that a provider of an AED shall assure that anticipated users of AEDs are trained using a nationally recognized, evidence-based guidelines course.
Title
Relates to causes of action against certain businesses arising in connection with the AED; provides that gross negligence by a business or employee must be shown; provides that a provider of an AED shall assure that anticipated users of AEDs are trained using a nationally recognized, evidence-based guidelines course.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-18 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8741C | |
2010-06-18 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1052 | |
2010-06-17 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-04-26 | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08741 (Same As) 2010-07-30 - signed chap.243
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07603&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |