NY S07602 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to theft of services for the use of a highway, parkway, bridge or tunnel.
Title
Relates to theft of services for the use of a highway, parkway, bridge or tunnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1054 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |