NY S07530 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disability benefits for NYC fire department members who are New York city enhanced plan members.
Title
Relates to disability benefits for NYC fire department members who are New York city enhanced plan members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.878 |
2016-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10055 (Same As) 2016-05-09 - referred to governmental employees